Dear readers,

Presenting you some short Multiplication Tricks which will help you save precious time in exams.

### Multiplication by 5

Multiply the number by 10/2 because 5 = 10/2.

**Examples:**

- 46×5 = 460/2 = 230
- 106×5 = 1060/2 = 53
- 27×5 = 270/2 = 135

### Multiplication by 25

Multiply the number by 100/4 because 25 = 100/4.

**Examples:**

- 36×25 = 36×100/4 = 900
- 64×25 = 64×100/4 = 1600
- 17×25 = 17×100/4 = 425

### Multiplication by 125

Multiply the number by 1000/8 because 125 = 1000/8.

**Example:**

- 72×125=72×1000/8=9000
- 112×125=112×1000/8=14000
- 42×125=42×1000/8=5250

### Multiplication of two digit number having same unit digit

Let’s understand with the help of an example.

Let’s calculate answer of 63 X 43

**Step 1: **In the first step multiply unit place digit of both the number it is our last two digits.
**Step 2:** In the second step multiply 6×4=24, now add 3 in 24 (24+3 = 27), so 27 will be our first two digits.

Therefore answer is 2709.

**Example:**

- 35×75 = 2625
- 21×31 = 701

### Multiplication with the number having 5 at units place

Let’s understand with the help of an example.

Let’s calculate answer of 34 X 15

34×15 = 34/2×30 = 510

**Explanation: **Divide the first number by 2 and double the number having unit place 5.

**Example:**

- 26×45 = 26/2×90 = 13×90 = 1170
- 27×35 = 26/2×70 = 910+35 = 945
- 17×25 = 16/2×50 = 8×50= 400+25 = 425

### Multiplication number under twenty

Let’s take example to calculate the answer of 12×14

**Step 1:** Multiply the numbers at unit place i.e. 2×4 = 08.
**Step 2:** Now add the first number and unit digit of second number i.e. 12+4 = 16
**Step 3: **Now combine step 2 and 1 so that answer is 1608. 16 will be first two digits of the answer and 08 will be the last two digits.

**Example:**

- 13×12 = 1506

### Practice Questions

Now is the time for you to try some questions urself.

- 18×14
- 34×15
- 26×15
- 66×15
- 27×35
- 14×16
- 13×12
- 18×16
- 63×43
- 21×81
- 39×79
- 46×66
- 36×25
- 64×25
- 112×125
- 42×125
- 17×25
- 27×5
- 106×5
- 18×17

**Download as PDF**

**Read previous: « Squares Tricks**